Palmer v. Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Plaintiff: Ronald Palmer and Carol Palmer
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00712
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS OR FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 18, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Defendant shall file any opposition to the motion to remand and the motion for sanctions on or before March 8, 2010. Plaintiffs' replies shall be due on or before March 12, 2010. The hearing, if any, on plaintiffs' motions will take place on Friday, March 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT FILED FEBRUARY 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Palmer
Represented By: Stephen Michael Tigerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Palmer
Represented By: Stephen Michael Tigerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Represented By: James Carl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?