California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform v. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2010cv00773
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/30/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 14 STIPULATION and [proposed] order re settlement and dismissal by Department of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 13 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/9/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 9/9/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter unreported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 10 STIPULATION and [proposed] order continuing case management conference by Department of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
May 14, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 11, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: #8 CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 8 STIPULATION and proposed order continuing case management conference by Department of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 7 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 6 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform (Schwartz, Amitai) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to respond to complaint by Department of Health and Human Services. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform (Schwartz, Amitai) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 23, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2010 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611042742). Filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform v. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform
Represented By: Amitai Schwartz
Represented By: Moira Isabel Eileen Duvernay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?