Hoffman v. IndyMac Bank FSB et al

Plaintiff: Delaine M. Hoffman
Defendant: IndyMac Bank FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, First American Title Insurance Company and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00802
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The remaining claims in the FAC, specifically, plaintiffs state law claims, are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to plaintiffs refiling such claims in state court.In light of the dismissal of plaintiffs state law claims, the deferred portion of defendants motion to dismiss is hereby DENIED as moot, and plaintiffs motion, filed October 5, 2010, for an enlargement of time to serve defendant First American Title Insurance Company is hereby DENIED as moot. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING REMAINING CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DENYING AS MOOT DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 18, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 27, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT; EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The deadline to file a Second Amended Complaint is extended to October 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
August 31, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the First, Secon d, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action, and the federal claim alleged in the Fifth Cause of Action, the motion is granted. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of plaintiff's state law claims, the Court defers ruling thereon. If plaintiff wi shes to file a Second Amended Complaint for the purpose of amending her FDCPA claim and/or her claim for damages under TILA, plaintiff shall file and serve a Second Amended Complaint no later than September 20, 2010. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 8, 2010 to November 19, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 31, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 28, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING AUGUST 6, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from August 13, 2010 to October 8, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 1, 2010.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
June 25, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY TWO CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. No later than July 16, 2010, plaintiff shall fil e any opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, and shall include therein any argument as to why her claim for rescission and her claim based on Article I, Section 7 of the California Constitution should not be dismissed. No later than July 2 3, 2010, defendants shall file any reply to plaintiff's opposition. The hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is continued from July 9, 2010 to August 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 4, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on the motion to dismiss, filed by OneWest Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corporation, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Gayle Jameson, and Federal National Mortgage Association, is continued from July 2, 2010 to July 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 28, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. The Initial Case Management is continued to August 13, 2010, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 7. A Joint Case Management Statemen t shall be filed no later than August 6, 2010. All other deadlines set forth in the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines are continued accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
March 30, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The deadline to file a First Amended Complaint is extended to April 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. IndyMac Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaine M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?