OneWest Bank, FSB v. Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: OneWest Bank, FSB
Defendant: Benjamin Sanchez and Elvia Sanchez
Case Number: 3:2010cv00936
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REMAND, REMANDING ACTION TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER VACATING CMC; ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OneWest Bank, FSB v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Doug Viet Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvia Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?