Elam v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wendell Elam
Defendant: OPEIU Local 29 and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00938
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2010 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: #2 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER determining that cases are NOT related. Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/10/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #2 ADR Scheduling Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/29/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 6 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge & REQUEST for Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge Filed by Pro se Plaintiff Wendell Elam. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 5 Opposition to re #4 Determination of Related Case Filed by Pro se Plaintiff Wendell Elam. (Related document(s) #4 ). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/21/2010. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filed by Pro se Plaintiff Wendell Elam. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 6/8/2010 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 6/15/2010 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - [No Summons Issued] against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. &OPEIU Local 29, [Filing Fee: Ifpp Entered on 3/4/2010]. Filed by Pro se Plaintiff Wendell Elam. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPEIU Local 29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?