Bossier v. Charles Schwab Disability Plan et al

Plaintiff: James Bossier
Defendant: Charles Schwab Disability Plan and Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 3:2010cv00971
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON AND THE CHARLES SCHWAB DISABILITY PLAN WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/10/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 11/24/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
May 27, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 5 DISMISSING DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB DISABILITY PLAN. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/27/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bossier v. Charles Schwab Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bossier
Represented By: Samuel Gilmore Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?