Flores v. Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vince R. Flores
Defendant: Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc. and Mark D. Walsh
Case Number: 3:2010cv00993
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/02/2011. ***Civil Case Terminated. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson staying 46 Motion to strike affirmative defenses pending mediation. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 33 Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses from 31 32 Defendants' answers. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/26/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 25 Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default and denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince R. Flores
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?