Allstate Insurance Company v. ASKO Appliances, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: ASKO Appliances, Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: ASKO Cylinda A.B.
3rd_party_plaintiff: ASKO Appliances, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01039
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER CONTINUING December 8, 2011 Telephonic Hearing re: 77 82 the Parties' Discovery Dispute. Status Report due by 1/5/2012. Discovery Hearing reset for 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/2/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY AND ORDER re 83 Stipulation, filed by ASKO Appliances, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/16/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re: 77 October 19, 2011 Discovery Letter and Setting Telephonic Hearing. The parties are ordered to meet and confer within 7 days from the date of this order. If the parties are unable to resolve their dispute, they shall file a two-page jo int letter that outlines their proposed compromises within 3 days from the parties' meet-and-confer session. Further, a telephonic hearing to discuss the matter will be scheduled for November 17, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/31/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re 78 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 65 Stipulation filed by ASKO Appliances, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 9/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 48 DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLARIFICATION OF EXPERT TESTIMONY DISCLOSURE DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED AND PROPOSED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: 17 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. ASKO Appliances, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Juliette Vanessa Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASKO Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: James Ira Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: ASKO Cylinda A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: ASKO Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?