craigslist, Inc. v. GraphOn Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Defendant: GraphOn Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv01156
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Filing 38 United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit CASE NUMBER 2011-1149 for re 36 Notice of Appeal filed by GraphOn Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 27, 2010 Filing 37 Transmission of Notice of Appeal & Docket Sheets to the UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT re 36 Notice of Appeal. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to re 35 Judgment & Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant GraphOn Corporation - [Filing Fee: $455.00, Receipt Number 34611054280]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 35 JUDGMENT by Clerk: In accordance with the Courts Order dated December 10, 2010, JUDGMENT is entered under Rule 54(b) in favor of Plaintiffs based on the Courts Order of November 23, 2010, on their claims that the 6,324,538, 6,850,940, 7,028,034, and 7,269,591 Patents are invalid. All case activities are hereby STAYED. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING re 112 JOINT MOTION for Final Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 3:10-cv-00604-EDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re 114 in 3:10-cv-00604, 35 in 3:10-cv-01156-EDL) Judgment, Case Stayed. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
October 19, 2010 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Completion of Expert Discovery 2/11/2011 &Pretrial Conference re-set for 3/8/2011 at 2:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Pretrial Deadlines For Inequitable Conduct Hearing--As Modified. re (103 in 3:10-cv-00604-EDL) Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Fox Audience Network, Inc., MySpace, Inc., GraphOn Corporation, craigslist, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 19, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 32 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 1, 2010, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting (86) Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply in opposition to motion for summary judgment in case 3:10-cv-00604-EDL (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on September 24, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. pacific time. All participants shall dial 1-805-360-1000. Then press 521818# and you will be connected to the conference call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 30 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Martin Quinn as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 77 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Pretrial Schedule until 8/27/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 23, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re (38) Motion for Hearing; Denying re (40) Motion in case 3:10-cv-00604-EDL. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 1, 2010 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Scheduled for 9/30/2010 at 9:30 a.m.. Opposition brief due 8/3/2010 & Reply brief due 9/3/2010. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/1/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 21, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 6/21/2010. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING Case Management Conference for 6/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/15/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Laporte for all further proceedings. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/10/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge ELizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/07/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 22 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, June 21, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time (2:00 p.m. Eastern time). The ADR Unit will initiate the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 24, 2010 Filing 21 ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by GraphOn Corporation, GraphOn Corporation. (Rounds, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES C-10-1156 AND C-10-1156 re (35 in 3:10-cv-00604-CRB) Stipulation filed by GraphOn Corporation. The Master Docket and Master File for the Consolidated Actions shall be Civil Action C-10-0604CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/13/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/5/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by GraphOn Corporation (Rounds, Michael) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rounds, Michael) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against GraphOn Corporation. Filed bycraigslist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kao, Christopher) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 14 ANSWER TO 7 COUNTERCLAIM of GraphOn Corporation bycraigslist, Inc. (Kao, Christopher) (Filed on 4/29/2010) Modified on 4/30/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A.K. Yowell) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Adam K. Yowell) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045055.) filed by GraphOn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Barnard) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by GraphOn Corporation, GraphOn Corporation (Rounds, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against craigslist, Inc., craigslist, Inc. byGraphOn Corporation, GraphOn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rounds, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 6, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION of Melissa Pagni Barnard for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611044330) filed by GraphOn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by craigslist, Inc.. (Kao, Christopher) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by craigslist, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Craig Newmark, Other Affiliate Jim Buckmaster, Other Affiliate eBay Domestic Holdings, Inc. for craigslist, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against GraphOn Corporation (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611043695). Filed by craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: craigslist, Inc. v. GraphOn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GraphOn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?