Roadway Electrical Works, Inc. v. Telegra, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roadway Electrical Works, Inc.
Defendant: Telegra-Europe and Telegra, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01175
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUNIG CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Stipulation, filed by Roadway Electrical Works, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/5/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANANGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT re 17 Stipulation, filed by Telegra, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 7/27/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE PLEADING re 14 Stipulation filed by Telegra, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 7/15/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING re 11 Stipulation, filed by Telegra, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Stipulation, filed by Telegra, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/1/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roadway Electrical Works, Inc. v. Telegra, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telegra-Europe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telegra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadway Electrical Works, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?