Zeisel v. Diamond Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Elliot Zeisel
Defendant: Diamond Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01192
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 242 STIPULATION REGARDING CY PRES DISTRIBUTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
January 16, 2013 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CORRESPONDENCE: The Court has received a letter from a class member regarding the manner in which his claim has been processed. The Court shall electronically file a copy of the letter, so that counsel may take whatever action they deem appropriate. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/16/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
October 16, 2012 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 215 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and GRANTING IN PART 216 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Plaintiff Incentive Award. ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 16, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 9, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 9, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
August 20, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 215 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and 216 Motion for Settlement, and REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 20, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
January 30, 2012 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT TO ADDRESS NEW LAW. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
December 6, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING PLACEHOLDER HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT: Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 8, 2011 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 199 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 8, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 31, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 197 Stipulation STAYING ALL DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/31/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 19, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 195 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF THE DECLARATION OF SARAH ROLLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND THE EXHIBITS THERE TO, EXCERPTS OF AND EXHIBIT I TO THE DECLAR ATION OF JEFFREY S. BOSLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNA TIVE, FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 13, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON FORM AND METHOD OF CLASS NOTICE; CONTINUING DEADLINES AND VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing on MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 3/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 1/13/2012. Replies due by 2/10/2012. Last Daty for Expert Discovery: 2/24/2012. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 3, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 164 MOTION TO APPROVE PLAN AND FORM OF NOTICE AND CLASS DEFINITION. Status Conference set for 10/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Status Conference Statement due by 11:00 a.m. on October 12, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 3, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
August 30, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 160 Stipulated Request Amending June 13, 2011 Order Scheduling Trial and Pretrial Matters. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/30/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 13, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 153 Stipulation to Modify Trial and Pretrial Matters. Discovery due by 8/31/2011. Expert Witness List due by 10/21/2011. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffr ey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 13, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 7, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 75 Motion to Certify Class. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Portions of Reply Brief and French Declaration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Administrative Motion to Seal Diamond Foods, Inc.'s Objections to New Evidence. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 2, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 11, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING on 75 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 11, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 9, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause re Sealing. Defendant to file a revised redacted version of its opposition brief by May 13, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 9, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 2, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendant's Administrative Motion to Seal and Order to Plaintiff to Show Cause.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 1, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/1/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 9, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (January 25, 2011 Transcript) filed by Elliot Zeisel. Signed by Judge Laporte on 2/9/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 3, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 61 Joint Stipulated Request Amending October 10, 2010 Order Scheduling Trial and Pretrial Matters: Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2011. Discovery due by 6/27/2011. Expert Witness List due by 7/27/2011. Further Case Manageme nt Conference set for 6/17/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 25, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TEMPORARILY SEALING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Laporte on 1/25/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
October 19, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 15, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/15/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 13, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 16, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
June 21, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND TERMINATING 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AS MOOT.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/21/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeisel v. Diamond Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Zeisel
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?