Goodman Ball, Inc. et al v. Mach II Aviation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Goodman Ball, Inc. and Peter Arger
Defendant: Mach II Aviation, Inc., Escape Velocity of Tampa Bay, Inc., John Stanton and Walter Holmich
Case Number: 3:2010cv01249
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, MOTION TO TRANSFER, AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE [re 35 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Escape Velocity of Tampa Bay, Inc., Peter Arger, John Stanton]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/22/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 9/22/2010 AT 11:00 AM [re 28 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Goodman Ball, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/16/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman Ball, Inc. et al v. Mach II Aviation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodman Ball, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Mansour Ahmadshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Arger
Represented By: Michael Mansour Ahmadshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mach II Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escape Velocity of Tampa Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Holmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?