Electronic Scrip Inc v. PNC Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Electronic Scrip Inc
Defendant: PNC Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2010cv01269
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 46 Stipulation filed by PNC Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RESETTING STATUS. Status Report due by 6/22/2011. Status Conference set for 6/29/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for service of intial disclosures re 37 Stipulation filed by Electronic Scrip Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER allowing appearance by telephone 31 Case Management Statement filed by Electronic Scrip Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/16/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Stipulation Extending time to provide initial disclosure filed by Electronic Scrip Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 7 Stipulation filed by PNC Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Scrip Inc v. PNC Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Scrip Inc
Represented By: Dylan James Liddiard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank National Association
Represented By: Raymond Yoon Ho Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?