Finelite, Inc. v. Ledalite Architectural Products
Plaintiff: Finelite, Inc.
Defendant: Ledalite Architectural Products
Case Number: 3:2010cv01276
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CHANGE DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 3, 2010 to January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CHANGE DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to December 3, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 24, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT XII; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CHANGE DATES OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued from July 30, 2010 to September 3, 2010, and the Case Management Conference is continued from July 16, 2010 to October 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CYNTHIA D. VREELAND PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finelite, Inc. v. Ledalite Architectural Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finelite, Inc.
Represented By: Karen I. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ledalite Architectural Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?