Metropolitan Life Insurance Comany v. Bro et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Comany
Defendant: Elizabeth Bro, Jean Jones, Mary Cunningham, Teresa Knight and Carrie Zunich
Case Number: 3:2010cv01312
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/11/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 16 Motion to Change Venue (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CARRIE ZUNICH'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/14/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING CARRIE ZUNICH TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Deposit Funds with Court filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Continuing Last Day To Respond to Interpleader re 11 Stipulation filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Comany. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/27/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 9 Stipulation filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Comany. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/23/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Comany v. Bro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Comany
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Bro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Zunich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?