Incredible Adventures, Inc. v. Backen et al
Plaintiff: Incredible Adventures, Inc.
Defendant: Vincent Backen, Joanne Keune and White Holly Expeditions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv01389
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Stipulation For Dismissal of Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/14/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Vacating Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 23 Stipulation to Waive Requirements of Admiralty Local Rule 4-8 Requiring Hearing Within 3 Days of FRCP Supp. Rule E(4)(f) Motion to Vacate and Set Hearing on September 10, 2010.Hearing on Motion to Quash set for 9/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/25/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint, Granting Time to Move to Quash Attachment Herein and Staying Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order to US Marshal Regarding Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Issued. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 8 , 3 for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Incredible Adventures, Inc. v. Backen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incredible Adventures, Inc.
Represented By: Mark K. deLangis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Backen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Keune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Holly Expeditions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?