Spindler et al v. Johnson & Johnson Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Barton Spindler, Deborah Underwood and Valerie Burks
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Corp. and Omnicare, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01414
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 88 Application for Entry of Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 12, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
June 15, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 84 StipulationOrder re: Case Management Conference Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 23, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REVISION RE 77 Order. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 23, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
January 13, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
October 7, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE: STIPULATION RE BRIEFING,HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 5, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 55 STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING, HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE: Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/5/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 10, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
August 24, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF URVASHI SEN FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 13, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 8, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ALEXANDER M. KAYNE FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
April 27, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Stipulation filed by Omnicare, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D.Laporte on April 27, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spindler et al v. Johnson & Johnson Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barton Spindler
Represented By: Thomas V. Girardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Underwood
Represented By: Thomas V. Girardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Burks
Represented By: Thomas V. Girardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?