Elliott v. Adknowledge, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Elliott
Defendant: Adknowledge, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01495
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 97 STIPULATION Vacating All Existing Deadlines and Hearings and Scheduling a Status Conference Date. Status Report due by 4/11/2014. Status Conference set for 4/18/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified on 3/3/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 91 STIPULATION for Continuance of the Trial Date and All Related Dates. Jury Selection set for 3/26/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/31/201 4 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whitee on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 88 STIPULATION Reopening Expert Discovery to Allow Expert Deposition. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 67 Stipulation FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEPOSITION CUT-OFF DATE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF BILL INTRATER AND JOHN KERR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Supplement Evidence. The hearing scheduled for 5/27/2011 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 58 Stipulation for Continuance of The Trial Date and All Related Dates. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 Stipulation Continuing Deadline for Mediation By 4 Days and Extending Time to Complete Non-Expert Depositions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation Continuing Deadline for Expert Witness Disclosures. Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 02/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation Continuing Deadline to Complete Private Mediation.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Adknowledge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Elliott
Represented By: Philip B. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adknowledge, Inc.
Represented By: Leila Narvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?