Gee et al v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Gee, Roxanne Mazarakis and Jody Soto
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01509
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/14/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/12/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/8/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Vacating Hearing Scheduled for November 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/14/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE: 103 Stipulation, filed by Jody Soto, Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., Roxanne Mazarakis, Gary Gee Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE: 49 GRANTING MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF NOTICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/18/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 32 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/9/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: 6 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/16/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gee et al v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gee
Represented By: Rachel M. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Mazarakis
Represented By: Rachel M. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Soto
Represented By: Rachel M. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?