Lender Financial Group, LLC v. Palomares et al
Plaintiff: Lender Financial Group, LLC
Defendant: Jissel Palomares and Jose Garcia
Case Number: 3:2010cv01612
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER VACATING HEARING RE DKT #11 Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/27/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/20/2007.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/29/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lender Financial Group, LLC v. Palomares et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lender Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: James Dale Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jissel Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?