Borchers v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Bruce Borchers
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv01706
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The court-appointed mediator having advised the Court that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims alleged against defendant be dismissed without prejudice; provided, howev er, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
August 13, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/13/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
June 25, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 21, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borchers v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Borchers
Represented By: Bruce E. Krell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?