Hoyt v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Hoyt
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and George Gascon
Case Number: 3:2010cv01778
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 126 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/29/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/12/2012 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/3/2012. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/11)(rslc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 85 TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND RE-OPENING OF DISCOVERY. Jury Selection set for 1/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 65 Letter filed by Timothy Hoyt, 68 Letter filed by George Gascon, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/23/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman terminating 42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 54 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL UNDER SEAL re 41 Proposed Order filed by George Gascon, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/29/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 31 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/22/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hoyt
Represented By: Michael Robert Bracamontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?