Dytch v. Gebreab et al
Plaintiff: Albert Dytch
Defendant: Yohanes Gebreab, Zemam Gebreab and George Kifle
Case Number: 3:2010cv01928
Filed: May 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 19 Stipulation filed by Albert Dytch. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RESETTING CMC 17 Case Management Statement filed by Albert Dytch. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 2:30 P.M. ON 3/16/11. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dytch v. Gebreab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Dytch
Represented By: Thomas N. Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yohanes Gebreab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zemam Gebreab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kifle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?