Dubee v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ian Dubee
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. and P.F. Chang's III,LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv01937
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED by Hon. William Alsup denying 66 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 26, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 48 Letter, filed by Ian Dubee]. Further meet-and-confer in Attorney's Lounge on 18th floor of federal courthouse starting from 8:30 and ending 11:30 AM. Discovery response due by noon on 11/15/2010. Discovery Hearing set for 11/16/2010 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 20, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE (10/20/2010) [re 42 Letter filed by Ian Dubee]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/15/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 26 Motion to Transfer Case (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 21 Stipulation filed by Ian Dubee]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/27/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 5, 2010, AT 11:00 A.M. [re 18 Stipulation filed by P.F. Chang's III,LLC, P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/27/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CASES ARE NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubee v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Dubee
Represented By: Heather Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Chang's III,LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?