Verient, Inc. v. Orbis Patents Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Verient, Inc.
Defendant: Orbis Patents Ltd., Orbiscom Ireland Ltd. and Orbiscom Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01946
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/5/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND EXTENDING ADR AND 269F) REPORT DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/30/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 10 Stipulation filed by Verient, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10-1946. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verient, Inc. v. Orbis Patents Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verient, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbis Patents Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbiscom Ireland Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbiscom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?