Delegat's Wine Estate Limited v. American Wine Distributors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delegat's Wine Estate Limited
Defendant: American Wine Distributors, Inc. and Michael F. Denny
Case Number: 3:2010cv02215
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/1/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying re 129 Motion for New Trial. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/27/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing 129 Motion for New Trial; granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for New Trial, 129 MOTION for New Trial Responses due by 4/24/2012. Replies due by 5/1/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 130 Stipulation (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/28/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER -DELETING DOCUMENT NOS. 119 AND 120. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/21/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/16/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/14/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO BRING TRIAL EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/7/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO USE COURTCALL FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT FURTHER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/6/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/2/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/25/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Application to Appear Telephonically re 39 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/17/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Good cause appearing, the request to extend dates is granted. The new pretrial and trial dates are: 1. Discovery cutoff: September 15, 2011. The extended discovery period is to accommodate the discovery se t forth in Plaintiffs letter and is not a full re-opening of the discovery period. 2.Initial expert disclosures: November 1, 2011. 3.Rebuttal expert disclosures: November 16, 2011. 4.Expert discovery cutoff: November 30, 2011. 5.Last day to hear dispositive motions: November 8, 2011. 6.Pretrial conference: January 24, 2012. 7.Trial: February 13, 2012. In all other respects, the September 24, 2010 Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial remains in effect. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/17/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY. The new pretrial and trial dates are:1.Discovery cutoff: June 15, 2011. 2.Initial expert disclosures: August 1, 2011. 3.Rebuttal expert disclosures: August 16, 2011. 4.Exp ert discovery cutoff: August 30, 2011. 5.Last day to hear dispositive motions: August 9, 2011. 6.Pretrial conference: October 18, 2011. 7.Trial: November 7, 2011. In all other respects, the September 24, 2010 Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial remains in effect. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/22/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Request to Appear Telephonically re 16 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/1/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delegat's Wine Estate Limited v. American Wine Distributors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delegat's Wine Estate Limited
Represented By: Andrew J. Bayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Wine Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?