White v. City of Concord et al
Plaintiff: Troy White
Defendant: City of Concord and Mike Kindorf
Case Number: 3:2010cv02237
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS, WITH PREJUDICE, PER FRCP 41(A)(1). Pursuant to stipulation, the action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/14/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ADR. The new ADR completion deadline is now March 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS. Pursuant to stipulation. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/29/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF SEVERAL CLAIMS FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE, PER FRCP 41(A)(1). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/6/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/13/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties' stipulation to mediation is granted; the deadline for the mediation session is 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 1, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. City of Concord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy White
Represented By: Edward Charles Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Concord
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kindorf
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?