Patterson v. California State Departmen of Motor Vehicles et al
Plaintiff: Kory L.E. Patterson
Defendant: California State Departmen of Motor Vehicles and George Valverde
Case Number: 3:2010cv02308
Filed: May 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING, LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS & AUTHORITIES, AND LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting extension (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. California State Departmen of Motor Vehicles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory L.E. Patterson
Represented By: Paul R. Burglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Departmen of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Valverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?