Lim v. Target National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Cornelio Lim
Defendant: Target National Bank and Vicki West
Case Number: 3:2010cv02349
Filed: May 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/11/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/18/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/12/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT VICKI WEST TO ATTEND THE MEDIATION TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/13/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE LAST DATE TO MEDICATE CASE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 1/14/2011 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/05/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lim v. Target National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelio Lim
Represented By: Irving L. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target National Bank
Represented By: Gail C. Trabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki West
Represented By: Gail C. Trabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?