Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. v. Yelp! Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Astro Appliance Service, Celibre, Inc, Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc., Wag My Tail, Inc., J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Bleeding Heart, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc. and Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC
Defendant: Yelp! Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02351
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2010 Filing 99 NOTICE by Beck & Lee Business Trial Lawyers OF FILING ATTORNEYS PLEDGES OF JARED H. BECK AND ELIZABETH LEE BECK (Beck, Jared) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schur (Schur, Aaron) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 6, 2010 Filing 97 RESPONSE to re 96 Order, Attorney Pledges of Gregory S. Weston and Jack Fitzgerald by The Weston Firm. (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 9/6/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER APPOINTING ONGARO BURTT LLP LEAD COUNSEL for plaintiffs; Amended consolidated complaint to be filed within 30 days; Responsive pleadings to be filed 30 days thereafter; SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/24/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER withdrawing Attorneys Benjamin Hansel Kleine, Michael G. Rhodes, Michael Graham Rhodes, Sarah Ruth Boot and Matthew Dean Brown as attorneys of record for defendant YELP!; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/23/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 94 Statement re 86 Supplemental MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Proposed Six-Month Discovery Plan OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF BECK & LEE AS INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Beck & Lee Business Trial Lawyers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Beck, Jared) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 93 Brief re 86 Supplemental MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Proposed Six-Month Discovery Plan Supplimental Statement by The Weston Firm RE: Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel filed byCalifornia Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Wag My Tail, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order Consolidating Cases and Appointing Weston Firm and Ongaro Burtt Interim Lead Counsel)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE by Wag My Tail, Inc. of Termination of Beck & Lee firm as Counsel (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 91 NOTICE by California Furnishings, Inc. of Termination of Beck & Lee firm as Counsel (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. of Termination of Beck & Lee firm as Counsel (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 89 CLERKS NOTICE vacating 8/23/2010 Case Management Conference before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 88 Statement DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S STATEMENT ON PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by Yelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 87 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 88 . *** Statement DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S STATEMENT ON PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/26/2010) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2010 Filing 86 Supplemental MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Proposed Six-Month Discovery Plan filed by Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A)(Beck, Jared) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 85 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 19, 2010, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases 3:10-cv-01321-MHP; granting (64) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:10-cv-02351-MHP; Supplemental discovery briefing to be submitted by 7/26/2010; See order for more details (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 Filing 83 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2010 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 7/19/2010) re Motions to Consolidate/Motions to Compel (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE by Yelp! Inc. Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Civil L.R. 3-13) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 81 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 80 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yelp! Inc. FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement and L.R. 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 78 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 77 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CIVIL LOCAL RULE 16-10(a) filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE CMCS AND DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/8/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 75 Memorandum in Opposition re 66 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for Sanctions /Opposition to to Amended Notice of Motion to Compel (Docket No. 69) filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Brown, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 74 Reply Memorandum re 64 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byYelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 73 Reply Memorandum re 64 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Yelp's Motion to Consolidate and Cross-Motion filed byCats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE ACCELERATING hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel to 7/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 71 Memorandum in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Consolidate Cases DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CROSS-MOTION FOR:(A1) DESIGNATION OF CATS AND DOGS AS LEAD ACTION AND STAY OF LEVITT ACTION-OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE (A2) CONSOLIDATION OF ACTIONS, DEEMING CATS AND DOGS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS THE OPERATIVE PLEADING (B) APPOINTMENT OF THE WESTON FIRM AND BECK & LEE AS INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; AND (C) SUBMISSION OF FULLY-BRIEFED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR HEARING filed byYelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 70 Reply to Opposition re 66 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for Sanctions Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions filed byCats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth Lee Beck in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions)(Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. re 66 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for Sanctions Amended Notice of Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions, hearing set for 6/26/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Matthew D. Brown in Opposition to 67 Memorandum in Opposition,, Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Defendant Yelp's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time filed byYelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition re 66 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for SanctionsEmergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for Sanctions Defendant Yelp Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time filed byYelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 66 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time Relating to Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Monday, June 21, 2010, and Motion for Sanctions filed by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared H. Beck in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition, For Sanctions, and to Shorten Time, # 2 Declaration of Jack Fitzgerald in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition, For Sanctions, and to Shorten Time, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time)(Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. re 64 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Notice of Opposition to Yelp's Motion to Consolidate Cases and Cross-Motion (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Yelp's Motion to Consolidate and Cross-Motion, # 2 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 3 Declaration of Jack Fitzgerald in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 4 Declaration of Jared H. Beck in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 5 Declaration of Elizabeth Lee Beck in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 6 Proposed Order Denying Yelp's Motion to Consolidate and Granting Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 64 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Yelp! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Brown, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 4, 2010 Case reassigned to Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel; Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RELATING CASE to C 10-1321 MHP; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/3/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE by Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. of Stipulation & Administrative Motion to Relate Cases (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jack Fitzgerald Re Notice of Stipulation & Administrative Motion to Relate Cases)(Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 59 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Yelp! Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 58 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order re Discovery and Dispute Procedures, # 3 Notice of Trail Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge, # 4 Consent / Declination Form, # 5 Stnding Order for All Judges, # 6 Notice of Assignment of Case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:10-cv-01340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 3, 2010 Filing 56 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: COURT ORDER: (1) Motion to Transfer Venue 25 ; (2) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First amended Complaint 23 . Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure andLocal Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing set for 5/10/2010 at 1:30 PM., is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. The Court finds that Defendant has met its burden of showing that the Northern District of California is clearly more convenient and GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to that District. In light of this disposition, the separate Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Yelp!, Inc. (dkt. #23) is moot and taken off calendar. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: # 1 CV-22 Transmittal Letter - Civil Case Transfer Out) (jp)
April 29, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of Mootness of Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate Related Cases filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Weston, Gregory)
April 26, 2010 Filing 54 REPLY reply in support of motion MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 Defendant Yelp! Inc.s Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl of Matthew D. Brown, # 2 Declaration Decl of Matthew Tai; exh. A & exh. B, # 3 Declaration Decl of Marla Landa)(Brown, Matthew)
April 26, 2010 Filing 53 REPLY in support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10cv01578, 26 and to Set Schedule for Filing Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
April 23, 2010 Filing 52 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: For better calendar management, the Court continues the Scheduling Conference from 4/26/2010 to 5/10/2010 at 1:30 PM. The Court also continues the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 23 from 5/3/2010 to 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM. Said matters will be heard on 5/10/2010 with the Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case (dkt. #250 and Motion to consolidate Cases (dkt. #26). (jp)
April 22, 2010 Filing 51 REPLY Surreply in Opposition MOTION to Dismiss Case 23 filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Weston, Gregory)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank granting Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Brief Surreply and Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to defendant Yelp! Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint 41 . Plaintiffs are directed to file their proposed Surreply & Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Yelp's Motion to Dismiss within three (3) days. (jp)
April 21, 2010 Filing 49 Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc. (Brown, Matthew)
April 21, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Dean Brown on behalf of Defendant Yelp! Inc. (Brown, Matthew)
April 21, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael G Rhodes on behalf of Defendant Yelp! Inc. (Rhodes, Michael)
April 21, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Neha M Marathe on behalf of Defendant Yelp! Inc. (Marathe, Neha)
April 21, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin H Kleine on behalf of Defendant Yelp! Inc. (Kleine, Benjamin)
April 21, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Ruth Boot on behalf of Defendant Yelp! Inc. (Boot, Sarah)
April 21, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Surreply and Notice of of Supplemental Authority 41 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kbr)
April 21, 2010 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Surreply and Notice of of Supplemental Authority 41 served on April 21, 2010. (Weston, Gregory)
April 21, 2010 Filing 41 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Surreply and Notice of of Supplemental Authority filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Surreply, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gregory S. Weston ISO Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Surreply)(Weston, Gregory)
April 19, 2010 Filing 40 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 23 Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
April 19, 2010 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc., re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 35 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 34 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 36 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 32 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 38 , Response in Opposition to Motion, 31 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 37 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 33 served on 4/19/2010. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Gregory Perrault IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 37 DECLARATION of John Lewis IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Kevin DiCerbo IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc., Defendant Yelp! Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Yvonne Tannous IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Mary Seaton IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Jacob Aaron Blecher IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Lee Beck IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT YELP! INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Beck Decl., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Beck Decl.)(Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division 25 filed by Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Beck, Jared)
April 19, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10cv01578, 26 filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Consolidation)(Weston, Gregory)
April 13, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3); parties request to appear before a retired judicial officer or other dispute resolution body for mediation type settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Settlement Procedure Selection)(Weston, Gregory)
April 12, 2010 Filing 28 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Report) ; estimated length of trial 10 - 14 days, filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc... (Brown, Matthew)
April 12, 2010 Filing 27 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case 23 filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Weston, Gregory)
April 12, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10cv01578, filed by defendant Yelp! Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brown Decl, # 2 Exhibit Exhs A-H to Brown Decl, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 4 Cert of Service)(Brown, Matthew)
April 9, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Bryan Byrne, # 3 Exhibit Exh A to Byrne Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exh B to Byrne Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exh C to Byrne Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exh D to Byrne Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exh E to Byrne Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exh F to Byrne Declaration, # 9 Declaration Declaration of Matthew D. Brown, # 10 Exhibit Exh A to Brown Declaration, # 11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew)
April 7, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE Defendant Yelp! Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Civ.L.R. 83-1.4) filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Matthew)
April 1, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Defendant's Memorandum of Law ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Brown, Matthew)
April 1, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendat Yelp! Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. (Brown, Matthew) Modified on 4/12/2010 (kbr).
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND TO SET DATES FOR CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AND JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 15 and denying PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT, CONSOLIDATION, DESIGNATION OF LEAD CASE, AND APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL 16 . (kbr)
March 25, 2010 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-01578, 15 filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Weston, Gregory)
March 25, 2010 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Yelp! Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-01578, 15 served on 3/24/2010. (Brown, Matthew)
March 25, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 17 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kbr)
March 24, 2010 Filing 17 OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reassign Case No. 2:10-cv-01578 to the Hon. Valerie Baker Fairbank EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to No. 2:10-cv-01578, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel for the Classes 16 served on 03/24/2010. (Weston, Gregory)
March 24, 2010 Filing 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reassign Case No. 2:10-cv-01578 to the Hon. Valerie Baker Fairbank, EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to No. 2:10-cv-01578,, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel for the Classes filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' ex parte motion, # 2 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston, # 3 Exhibit A-E to Declaration of Gregory S. Weston, # 4 Declaration of Jack Fitzgerald, # 5 Declaration of Jared H. Beck, # 6 Declaration of Elizabeth Lee Beck)(Weston, Gregory)
March 24, 2010 Filing 15 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-01578, filed by defendant Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Ex Parte Application, # 2 Declaration Declaration of M. Brown, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to the Declaration of M. Brown, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 5 Disclosure Statement as to Interested Parties)(Brown, Matthew)
March 23, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the Notices of Filing Fee Due (PHV) 12 , 13 were docketed in error as to Attorneys Elizabeth Lee Beck and Jared H. Beck. Both are licensed in the state of California. (mg)
March 17, 2010 Filing 13 (See Notice of Clerical Error Below) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Elizabeth Lee Beck for Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 G-64) (mg) Modified on 3/23/2010 (mg).
March 17, 2010 Filing 12 (See Notice of Clerical Error Below) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jared H. Beck for Plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 G-64) (mg) Modified on 3/23/2010 (mg).
March 16, 2010 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc. (se)
March 16, 2010 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Yelp! Inc. amending Complaint 1 ; filed by Plaintiffs Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Astro Appliance Service, Bleeding Heart, LLC, California Furnishings, Inc., Celibre, Inc, J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc., Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC, San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC, Wag My Tail, Inc., Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc. Jury Demand. (mg) (jp).
March 16, 2010 Filing 9 OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., of 1) First Amended Complaint and 2) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties served on 03/16/2010. (Weston, Gregory)
March 12, 2010 Filing 8 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Yelp! Inc. answer now due 4/1/2010, filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc..(Rhodes, Michael)
March 11, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Yelp! Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:10-CV-01578 R-E (Rhodes, Michael)
March 3, 2010 Filing 6 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: COURT ORDER. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2010 at 8:30 AM. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report and a Notice of Settlement Procedure Selection Form ADR-1, on or before 4/12/2010. The title page of the report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that a mandatory chambers copy of the report be delivered to chambers by 12:00 p.m., the following day. If counsel fail to file the required Joint Rule 26(f) Report and a Notice of Settlement Procedure Selection form or fail to appear at the Scheduling Conference and such failure is not otherwise satisfactorily explained to the Court, the Court may take such action as it deems appropriate, such as monetary sanctions, or ultimately, dismissal or default. (jp)
March 2, 2010 Filing 5 OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., Judge's Standing Order served on 3/01/2010. (Weston, Gregory)
March 2, 2010 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Yelp! Inc. served on 2/25/2010, answer due 3/18/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tracy Ng, authorized employee of Yelp!, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Weston, Gregory)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND ADDS TO THE LOCAL RULES. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL IMMEDIATELY SERVE THIS ORDER ON ALL PARTIES, INCLUDING ANY NEW PARTIES TO THE ACTION. IF THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, THE DEFENDANT WHO REMOVED THE CASE SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER ON ALL OTHER PARTIES; Memoranda of points and authorities in support of or in opposition to motions shall not exceed 25 pages. Replies shall not exceed 12 pages. Conformed courtesy copies of all papers filed with the Court, including those filed electronically, shall be delivered on the next day of filing, by 12 noon, to the drop box outside the Chambers of Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. The Judge's Chambers are located at the end of the hallway, past the courtroom. (see document for further details.) (jp)
February 23, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. (et) (ds).
February 23, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Yelp! Inc. (et)
February 23, 2010 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Yelp! Inc. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. (et) Modified on 3/1/2010 (et). (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc. v. Yelp! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cats and Dogs Animal Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astro Appliance Service
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celibre, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zodiac Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wag My Tail, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L. Ferri Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bleeding Heart, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Bay Boat Cruises, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Furnishings, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Petite Retreat Day Spa, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp! Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Ruth Boot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?