Shared Memory Graphics, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: SHARED MEMORY GRAPHICS, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc., Nintendo of America Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv02475
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2010 Filing 206 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Darin Jeffrey Glasser (Glasser, Darin) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 205 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Timothy S. Teter (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 204 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Arkansas Counsel filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olesek, Megan Rae) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 203 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Miriam L. Martinez ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046987.) filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 202 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jeong-Ah Joy Lee ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046987.) filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 201 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michelle Carniaux ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046987.) filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 9, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 198 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 200 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19)(Kinsel, Grant) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Unopposed] (1) Exhibits in Support of its Motion to Disqualify Floyd & Buss LLP as Counsel for Shared Memory and (2) Portions of its Motion Referring to the Exhibits filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Joseph) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/9/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Rae Whyman Olesek of Kenyon & Kenyon LLP on behalf of defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. and Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation Ltd. (Olesek, Megan Rae) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 196 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 195 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 194 CLERKS NOTICE re receipt of transferred action. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 193 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 192 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:09-cv-05128. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 4, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER directing Clerk to immediately transfer case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on May 28, 2010. (jn)
June 1, 2010 Filing 190 AMENDED ORDER re 187 Order Transferring Case to Another District. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on May 28, 2010. (jn)
May 27, 2010 Filing 189 MOTION to Clarify by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Wermager, Matthew)
May 27, 2010 Filing 188 Letter re: Order transferring case to the Northern District of California. (cc: Clerk of Northern District of California) (src)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Northern California. Certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. (Transfer held for appeal time to run.). Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on May 27, 2010. (src)
May 27, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 180 plaintiff Shared Memory Graphic's motion to file under seal its response and supporting materials re 159 separate defendant Nintendo's motion to disqualify counsel. All replies shall also be filed under seal. (dlw). Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on May 27, 2010. (src)
May 26, 2010 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re 169 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Nintendo's Motion to Disqualify Floyd & Buss LLP filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
May 24, 2010 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Declarations in Support of Opposition to Motion to Disqualify In Camera by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKnight, Reese)
May 24, 2010 Filing 184 RESPONSE to Motion re 169 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Nintendo's Motion to Disqualify Floyd & Buss LLP filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Reese P. McKnight, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Reese P. McKnight)(Smith, Michael)
May 24, 2010 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re 181 MOTION for Leave to File Declarations in Support of Opposition to Motion to Disqualify In Camera and Dkt 182 filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Kinsel, Grant)
May 21, 2010 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 181 MOTION for Leave to File Declarations in Support of Opposition to Motion to Disqualify In Camera by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 21, 2010 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to File Declarations in Support of Opposition to Motion to Disqualify In Camera by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 21, 2010 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to File Brief and Supporting Materials In Opposition to Nintendo's Motion to Disqualify Under Seal by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 14, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 171 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Arthur Gollwitzer III is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter; denying 175 Motion to Expedite briefing schedule re 173 plaintiff's motion to unseal Nintendo's motion to disqualify. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on May 14, 2010. (src) Modified on 5/17/2010 (src).
May 13, 2010 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Opposition to 175 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Shared Memory Graphics LLC's Motion to Unseal by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1")(Kinsel, Grant) Modified on 5/14/2010 (tg).
May 12, 2010 Filing 178 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Apple Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Shared Memory Graphics, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Teter, Timothy)
May 12, 2010 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 173 MOTION to Unseal Document 162 Memorandum Brief in Support filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC AMENDED TO INCLUDE EXHIBITS by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(McKnight, Reese)
May 12, 2010 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 175 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Shared Memory Graphics LLC's Motion to Unseal by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 12, 2010 Filing 175 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Shared Memory Graphics LLC's Motion to Unseal by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 12, 2010 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 173 MOTION to Unseal Document 162 Memorandum Brief in Support filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 12, 2010 Filing 173 MOTION to Unseal Document 162 Memorandum Brief in Support filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (McKnight, Reese)
May 12, 2010 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc. re 170 Memorandum Brief in Support, 169 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Nintendo's Motion to Disqualify Floyd & Buss LLP Supplemental (Kinsel, Grant)
May 12, 2010 Filing 171 MOTION for Arthur Gollwitzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
May 10, 2010 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 169 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Nintendo's Motion to Disqualify Floyd & Buss LLP by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grant E. Kinsel, # 2 Declaration of Joseph P. Hamilton)(Kinsel, Grant)
May 10, 2010 Filing 169 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Nintendo's Motion to Disqualify Floyd & Buss LLP by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
May 7, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to defendant's 159 motion to disqualify is due on or before May 21, 2010. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on May 7, 2010. (src)
May 6, 2010 Filing 168 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Floyd, Adam)
April 29, 2010 Filing 167 AMENDED MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL AND HELD IN CLERK'S OFFICE. (tg)
April 27, 2010 Filing 166 APPENDIX by Counter Claimants Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc., Defendants Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc. re 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC. (Ney, Marshall)
April 27, 2010 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Ney, Marshall)
April 27, 2010 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT of Grant E. Kinsel filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC re 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL AND HELD IN CLERK'S OFFICE (tg)
April 27, 2010 Filing 163 APPENDIX by Plaintiff Shared Memory Graphics, LLC re 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL AND HELD IN CLERK'S OFFICE (tg)
April 27, 2010 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL AND HELD IN CLERK'S OFFICE. (tg)
April 27, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting separate defendant Nintendo Co. LTD.'s, 160 motion to file under seal documents supporting 159 motion to disqualify plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on April 27, 2010. (src)
April 22, 2010 Filing 161 REPLY by Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. re 158 Response of Shared Memory Graphics LLCs to Apple Incs Submmission of Additional Authority. (Teter, Timothy)
April 22, 2010 Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Hamilton, Joseph)
April 22, 2010 Filing 159 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Shared Memory Graphics LLC by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Hamilton, Joseph)
April 21, 2010 Filing 158 RESPONSE by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC re 157 Supplement,, Plaintiff's Response to Apple Inc.'s Submission of Additional Authority. (Patton, Nicholas)
April 20, 2010 Filing 157 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD., Counter Claimant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Crass, Kevin)
April 6, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting defendants Nintendo Co., Ltd. and Nintendo of America Inc.'s 144 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on April 6, 2010. (src)
April 2, 2010 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Chan on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Chan, Eric)
April 2, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 155 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric D. Chan is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on April 2, 2010. (src)
March 31, 2010 Filing 155 MOTION for Eric D. Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Young, Damon)
March 17, 2010 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Smith on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Smith, Michael)
March 17, 2010 Filing 153 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 135 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael J. Smith is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter; Motions terminated: 133 MOTION for Michael J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.;. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on March 17, 2010. (src)
March 17, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 149 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Gregory Magness terminated. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on March 17, 2010. (src)
March 16, 2010 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re 151 MOTION to Strike 146 Response in Support of Motion, Ort In the Alternative, Opposed Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Kinsel, Grant)
March 15, 2010 Filing 151 MOTION to Strike 146 Response in Support of Motion, Ort In the Alternative, Opposed Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Prol, H.)
March 15, 2010 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re 147 MOTION to Strike 142 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Re Exhibits B to I Submitted with Shared Memory's Response MOTION to Strike 142 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Re Exhibits B to I Submitted with Shared Memory's Response and Motion for Leave to File an Affidavit Authenticating Exhibits B to I filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Wermager, Matthew)
March 4, 2010 Filing 149 MOTION of J. Gregory Magness to Withdraw as Attorney by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Floyd, Adam)
March 4, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 148 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Buss terminated. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on March 4, 2010. (jrs)
March 2, 2010 Filing 148 MOTION of Brian K. Buss to Withdraw as Attorney by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Floyd, Adam)
March 1, 2010 Filing 147 MOTION to Strike 142 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Re Exhibits B to I Submitted with Shared Memory's Response by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Exhibits B to I)(Kinsel, Grant)
March 1, 2010 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Support re 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 1 and 2 of U.S. Patent No. 5,712,644 Are Invalid filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of the Material Facts, # 2 Declaration of Joseph P. Hamilton)(Kinsel, Grant)
February 23, 2010 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Teter, Timothy)
February 23, 2010 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
February 22, 2010 Filing 143 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 142 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Cooper, Kent)
February 22, 2010 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 1 and 2 of U.S. Patent No. 5,712,644 Are Invalid filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Rule 56.1(b) Statement, # 2 Exhibit B: '664 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C: Advanced Microprocessors and Peripherals, # 4 Exhibit D: Original Claims 2,3 & 5 from '664 Patent Specification, # 5 Exhibit E: 10-18-96 Office Action, # 6 Exhibit F: 5-29-97 Applicant Response, # 7 Exhibit G: 6-9-97 Notice of Allowability, # 8 Exhibit H: '279 Patent, # 9 Exhibit I: 10-14-97 Petition and Amendment Filed After Payment of Issue Fee)(Cooper, Kent)
February 19, 2010 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL IN CLERK'S OFFICE. (tg)
February 18, 2010 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Support re 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California Statement of Position filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
February 18, 2010 Filing 139 ***DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY***ORDER granting 136 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Under Seal filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. The Clerk is directed to file plaintiff's response in opposition to defendants' joint motion to transfer venue under seal. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on February 17, 2010. (src) Modified on 2/18/2010 (src).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Leave to file response under seal. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on February 17, 2010. (tg)
February 18, 2010 Filing 137 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2010. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2011 09:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Brian S. Miller. Signed by Honorable Brian S. Miller on February 18, 2010. (src)
February 16, 2010 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Under Seal by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 12, 2010 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Brian S. Miller, United States District Judge, Eastern District of Arkansas. Honorable Robert T. Dawson no longer assigned to the case. (jrs)
February 9, 2010 Filing 135 MOTION for Michael J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 5, 2010 Filing 134 STIPULATION re: Confidentiality of Venue Discovery by Apple Inc., Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Cunningham, Iain)
February 3, 2010 Filing 133 MOTION for Michael J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Extend. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 2, 2010. (tg)
January 28, 2010 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Limited Discovery Period and Deadlines Related to Motion to Transfer Venue 72 by Apple Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Faust, Matthew)
January 26, 2010 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Hamilton on behalf of Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc. (Hamilton, Joseph)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph P. Hamilton is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 26, 2010. (tg)
January 22, 2010 Filing 128 MOTION for Joseph P. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Joseph P. Hamilton)(Ney, Marshall)
January 21, 2010 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Pickett on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Pickett, John)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on January 21, 2010. (tg)
January 20, 2010 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION for Protective Order To Quash or Limit Depositions filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 20, 2010 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2010 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 2nd flr (Rm 213) before Honorable Erin L. Setser. (gh)
January 20, 2010 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Honorable Erin L. Setser: Telephone Conference held on 1/20/2010. (Court Reporter (recorded by conference operator).) (gh)
January 19, 2010 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION to Compel Venue Related Discovery from Nintendo of America Inc. and Motion for Sanctions filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 120 MOTION to Compel Venue Related Discovery from Nintendo of America Inc. and Motion for Sanctions filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC, 122 MOTION for Protective Order To Quash or Limit Depositions filed by Nintendo of America Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD.. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 19, 2010. Motions referred to Erin L. Setser.(tg)
January 15, 2010 Filing 122 MOTION for Protective Order To Quash or Limit Depositions by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of, # 2 Declaration of Grant E. Kinsel in Support of)(Kinsel, Grant)
January 15, 2010 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 120 MOTION to Compel Venue Related Discovery from Nintendo of America Inc. and Motion for Sanctions by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. 1, # 2 Exh. 2)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 15, 2010 Filing 120 MOTION to Compel Venue Related Discovery from Nintendo of America Inc. and Motion for Sanctions by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 15, 2010 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Wermager on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Wermager, Matthew)
January 15, 2010 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Alfred Schuneman on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Schuneman, Nicholas)
January 15, 2010 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Reese Patrick McKnight on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (McKnight, Reese)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 113 , 114 & 115 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew S. Wermager, Nicholas Alfred Schuneman and Reese Patrick McKnight are directed to immediately register as CM/ECF users if they have not already done so and enter an appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 13, 2010. (jn)
January 12, 2010 Filing 115 MOTION for Reese Patrick McKnight to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 12, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION for Nicholas Alfred Schuneman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 12, 2010 Filing 113 MOTION for Matthew S. Wermager to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 6, 2010 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 60 MOTION to Sever regarding New Authority by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 2/22/10. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 4, 2010. (jn)
December 30, 2009 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 1 and 2 of U.S. Patent No. 5,712,644 Are Invalid filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grant E Kinsel)(Kinsel, Grant)
December 30, 2009 Filing 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 1 and 2 of U.S. Patent No. 5,712,644 Are Invalid by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Magness, J.)
December 28, 2009 Filing 108 ANSWER/REPLY to 80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Nintendo Co., Ltd. by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Prol, H.)
December 28, 2009 Filing 107 ANSWER/REPLY to 79 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Nintendo of America, Inc. by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Prol, H.)
December 28, 2009 Filing 106 ANSWER/REPLY to 82 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Samsung Defendants by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Prol, H.)
December 23, 2009 Filing 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Claims 1 and 2 of U.S. Patent No. 5,712,644 Are Invalid by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of, # 2 Declaration of Grant Kinsel in Support of)(Kinsel, Grant)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 15, 2009. (tg)
December 14, 2009 Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO APPLE/SAMSUNG/SONYS MOTION TO TRANSFER V MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO APPLE/SAMSUNG/SONYS MOTION TO TRANSFER V filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file its reply to Defendants' Response (Doc. 100). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 14, 2009. (ms)
December 14, 2009 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Its Opposed Expedited Motion for Further Extension of Time and Motion for Permission to Obtain Discovery Related to Venue by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 11, 2009 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO APPLE/SAMSUNG/SONYS MOTION TO TRANSFER V MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO APPLE/SAMSUNG/SONYS MOTION TO TRANSFER V filed by Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Teter, Timothy)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 11, 2009. (jn)
December 9, 2009 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO APPLE/SAMSUNG/SONYS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO OBTAIN DISCOVERY RELATED TO VENUE by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 8, 2009 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Sever (SUR-REPLY) filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 8, 2009 Filing 96 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 95 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition of Motion to Sever. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 8, 2009. (ms)
December 7, 2009 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition of Motion to Sever by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Sur-Reply, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Sur-Reply, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Sur-Reply, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Sur-Reply)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 3, 2009 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
December 3, 2009 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc.. (Cate, Brandon)
December 3, 2009 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Cate, Brandon)
December 3, 2009 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.. (Cate, Brandon)
December 3, 2009 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Corporation of America. (Cate, Brandon)
December 3, 2009 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Corporation. (Cate, Brandon)
December 3, 2009 Filing 88 ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. Related document: 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Cate, Brandon)
December 3, 2009 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Glasser, Darin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Glasser, Darin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC. (Glasser, Darin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Glasser, Darin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronics Co.. (Glasser, Darin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 82 Samsung's ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Shared Memory Graphics, LLC by Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Related document: 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Glasser, Darin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Goss Dempsey on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Dempsey, Jamie)
December 3, 2009 Filing 80 ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Shared Memory Graphics, LLC by Nintendo Co. LTD.. Related document: 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Kinsel, Grant)
December 3, 2009 Filing 79 ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Shared Memory Graphics, LLC by Nintendo of America Inc.. Related document: 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Kinsel, Grant)
December 1, 2009 Filing 78 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 77 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Transfer to 12/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 1, 2009. (ms)
November 30, 2009 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
November 30, 2009 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Support re 60 MOTION to Sever filed by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
November 30, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by George Riley on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Riley, George)
November 30, 2009 Filing 74 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 71 Nintendo Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Sever. Nintendo Defendants are directed to immediately file their reply brief. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 30, 2009. (ms)
November 25, 2009 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 15 Batis Decl., # 16 Melarti Decl., # 17 Lee Decl., # 18 Buchanan Decl., # 19 Ina Decl., # 20 Kajii Decl.)(Teter, Timothy)
November 25, 2009 Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Apple Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Teter, Timothy)
November 25, 2009 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Server by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief In Support Of)(Kinsel, Grant)
November 23, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Myers on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Myers, Michael)
November 23, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Yagura on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Yagura, Ryan)
November 23, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Glasser on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Glasser, Darin)
November 20, 2009 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Sever filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 62 63 64 65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ryan K. Yagura, Michael L. Myers, George A. Riley, Darin J. Glasser are directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF users if they have not already done so and enter an appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 20, 2009. (jn)
November 19, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION for Darin J. Glasser to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Young, Damon)
November 19, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION for George A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Young, Damon)
November 19, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION for Michael L. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Young, Damon)
November 19, 2009 Filing 62 MOTION for Ryan K. Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Young, Damon)
November 13, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon Young on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Young, Damon)
November 9, 2009 Filing 60 MOTION to Sever by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael J. Song terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 5, 2009. (tg)
November 4, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION of Michael J. Song to Withdraw as Attorney by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Song, Michael)
October 29, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Gresalfi on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Gresalfi, Richard)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Richard L. Gresalfi is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 22, 2009. (jn)
October 21, 2009 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
October 20, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Iain Robert Cunningham on behalf of Apple Inc. (Cunningham, Iain)
October 20, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Teter on behalf of Apple Inc. (Teter, Timothy)
October 20, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Damstedt on behalf of Apple Inc. (Damstedt, Benjamin)
October 19, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon B. Cate on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Cate, Brandon)
October 19, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis V. Popovski on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Popovski, Lewis)
October 15, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Carniaux on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Carniaux, Michelle)
October 15, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jacob Faust on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Faust, Matthew)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lewis Popovski is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF users if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter; granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew Faust is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter; granting 45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michelle Carniaux is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 14, 2009. (tg)
October 14, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION for Richard S. Gresalfi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard S. Gresalfi in support of motion)(Quattlebaum, Steven) Modified on 10/15/2009 (tg).
October 9, 2009 Filing 45 MOTION for Michelle Carniaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Quattlebaum, Steven)
October 9, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION for Matthew J. Faust to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Quattlebaum, Steven)
October 9, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION for Lewis V. Popovski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Quattlebaum, Steven)
October 8, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Quattlebaum on behalf of Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. (Quattlebaum, Steven)
October 5, 2009 Filing 41 ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Apple Inc.. Related document: 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC.(Crass, Kevin)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer amended complaint; Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. answer due 12/3/2009; Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. answer due 12/3/2009; Sony Corporation answer due 12/3/2009; Sony Corporation of America answer due 12/3/2009; Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. answer due 12/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 23, 2009. (tg)
September 23, 2009 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Prol, H.)
September 22, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Gregory Magness on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Magness, J.)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Benjamin G. Damstedt is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 22, 2009. (jn)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Iain Cummingham is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 22, 2009. (jn)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Timothy S. Teter is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 22, 2009. (jn)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co.,Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC answer due 12/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 21, 2009. (jn)
September 21, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION for Benjamin G. Damstedt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
September 21, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION for Iain Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
September 21, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION for Timothy S. Teter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
September 18, 2009 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Prol, H.)
September 17, 2009 Filing 29 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Prol, H.)
September 14, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Song on behalf of Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc. (Song, Michael)
September 14, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant E. Kinsel on behalf of Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc. (Kinsel, Grant)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Grant E. Kinsel and Michael J. Song are directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 4, 2009. (tg)
September 2, 2009 Summons Reissued as to Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (cap)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nintendo Co. LTD. answer due 12/3/2009; Nintendo of America Inc. answer due 12/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 26, 2009. (tg)
August 26, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION for Grant E. Kinsel, Michael J. Song to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1--Affidavit of Grant E. Kinsel, # 2 Exhibit 2--Affidavit of Michael J. Song)(Ney, Marshall)
August 26, 2009 Summons Issued as to Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (cap)
August 25, 2009 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc., Plaintiff Shared Memory Graphics, LLC to 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 20 Amended Complaint,, 1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Certificate of Service))(Ney, Marshall)
August 25, 2009 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 20 Amended Complaint,, 1 Complaint,, by Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc., Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Ney, Marshall)
August 18, 2009 Filing 21 REPORT on the filing of Amended Complaint re by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC See attached document for specifics. (jn)
August 17, 2009 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sony Corporation of America, Apple Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Nintendo of America Inc., Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD., Nintendo Co. LTD., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, filed by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Various Wal-Mart advertisements, # 2 Patent information dated 1/27/98, # 3 Patent information dated 6/27/00)(jn)
August 17, 2009 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Apple, Inc. has through October 5, 2009, to file its responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 17, 2009. (ms)
August 14, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Apple Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 14, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Crass on behalf of Apple Inc. (Crass, Kevin)
August 14, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Robert T. Dawson for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 14, 2009. (gg)
July 30, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Daniel Gray on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
July 30, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Kenneth Prol on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Prol, H.)
July 30, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent J. Cooper on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Cooper, Kent)
July 30, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Buss on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Buss, Brian)
July 30, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Vincent Floyd on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Floyd, Adam)
July 28, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION for Kent J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 28, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Brian Buss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 28, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION for Adam V. Floyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 28, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION for H. Kenneth Prol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 28, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Joseph D. Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 28, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brian Buss is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 28, 2009. (aws)
July 28, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph D. Gray is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 28, 2009. (aws)
July 28, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Adam Floyd is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 28, 2009. (aws)
July 28, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. H. Kenneth Prol is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 28, 2009. (aws)
July 28, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kent J. Cooper is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 28, 2009. (aws)
July 17, 2009 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shared Memory Graphics, LLC. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 9, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carly Slack Anderson on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Anderson, Carly)
July 7, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey P. Culbertson on behalf of Shared Memory Graphics, LLC (Culbertson, Geoffrey)
July 2, 2009 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action re PATENT by SHARED MEMORY GRAPHICS, LLC See attached document for specifics. (tg)
July 2, 2009 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by SHARED MEMORY GRAPHICS, LLC. (tg)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, and Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 5001247), filed by SHARED MEMORY GRAPHICS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Various advertisements, # 2 Exhibit A cont'd Various advertisements, # 3 Exhibit B Patent dated 1/27/1998, # 4 Exhibit C Patent dated 6/27/2000)(tg) Modified on 7/6/2009 to remove jury demand (jn).
July 2, 2009 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff SHARED MEMORY GRAPHICS, LLC. Complaint 1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Adam Floyd, Brian K. Buss, Kent J. Cooper, H. Kenneth Prol and Joseph D. Gray. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (tg)
July 2, 2009 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., Nintendo Co. LTD., Nintendo of America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America and Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD. and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shared Memory Graphics, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARED MEMORY GRAPHICS, LLC
Represented By: Carly Slack Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo Co. LTD.
Represented By: Joseph Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Michelle Carniaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Carniaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Carniaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Carniaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Semiconductor Kyushu Corporation, LTD.
Represented By: Michelle Carniaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co.
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?