Ross v. Adam Associates et al
Plaintiff: Francois Ross
Defendant: Adam Associates, Marth Daniels, Kelly Snyder and Laura Putman
Case Number: 3:2010cv02486
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT upon Judge Illstons instruction, this case shall be administratively closed. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING DISPUTE TO ARBITRATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSERE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FAILURE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/14/10. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Adam Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marth Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Putman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?