Johnson v. British Petroleum of America
Plaintiff: Ron Johnson
Defendant: British Petroleum of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv02505
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 05/31/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Relief of Order Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(B)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/8/2011. (Attachments: #(1) Proof of Service) (tnS) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Ron Johnson, 29 First MOTION for Entry of Default by court order filed by Ron Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 14, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Response filed by Ron Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 11, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. British Petroleum of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Petroleum of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?