Holland v. City of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Elicia R. Holland
Defendant: City of San Francisco, County of San Francisco, Heather Fong, John Burke, Dan McDonagh, Mathew Neves, Hinds and Michael Hennessey
Case Number: 3:2010cv02603
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 181 Motion for New Trial (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER re supplemental brifing on Rule 50(b) motion. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/10/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re written 160 and oral 159 objections to proposed jury instructions distributed to the parties by the Court. Stipulation, if any, due no later than 8:00 a.m. on Thursday, May 2, 2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/01/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 115 filed by Elicia R. Holland (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 144 Motion in Limine. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re 144 Sixth MOTION in Limine filed by Elicia R. Holland, ***Deadlines terminated. 144 Sixth MOTION in Limine filed by Elicia R. Holland. Objections due by 4/22/2013 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/18/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 111 Motion in Limine; granting 112 Motion in Limine; granting 113 Motion in Limine; denying 114 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion in Limine. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendants Heather Fong (Chief of San Francisco Police) and Dan McDonagh re 133 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Trial Rules Order Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/08/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to appear for scheduled hearing. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/6/2013 01:30 PM.Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/05/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re 77 Letter filed by County of San Francisco, Barnes, Michael Hennessey, Mathew Neves, John Burke, City of San Francisco, Dan McDonagh, Philip Papale, Heather Fong. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/15/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 73 Stipulation to continue Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER for (1) PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; and (2) DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT SFPD OFFICER JOSHUA HINDS. Motions terminated re: 56 MOTION to Amend. Defendant Officer Hinds Terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/02/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 44 Discovery Matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 6, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/08/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re October 18, 2010 hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/2010. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting briefing schedule re 15 MOTION to dismiss. Opposition due on or before 09/20/10 and reply due on or before 09/27/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 7 Stipulation filed by County of San Francisco, Michael Hennessey, Mathew Neves, John Burke, City of San Francisco, Hinds, Dan McDonagh, Heather Fong. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/17/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. City of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elicia R. Holland
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan McDonagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Neves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?