Community Oriented Correctional Health Services, Inc. v. Nava Counseling Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Community Oriented Correctional Health Services, Inc.
Defendant: Nava Counseling Services, LLC and Lee King
Case Number: 3:2010cv02667
Filed: June 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO DOCKET #31. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/31/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Notice (Other) filed by Community Oriented Correctional Health Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/2/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 2/7/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Ann Schneider terminated (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Oriented Correctional Health Services, Inc. v. Nava Counseling Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Oriented Correctional Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nava Counseling Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?