Perri v. CA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Perri
Defendant: CA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02675
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER vacating hearing re 31 Order to Show Cause; dismissing case for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 6, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/11/2011 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2011.. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 17, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE BY WHICH TO COMPLETE ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/1/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Date by Which to Complete ADR Process re 24 Stipulation filed by CA, Inc. Mediation deadline 5/31/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re doc 22 filed by Lisa Marie Perri. The last date to have the mediation occur in this action through the court's program shall be extended from 2/1/2011 to 3/1/2011. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/18/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/28/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 12 selecting Mediation filed by Lisa Marie Perri. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/23/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISCHARGING 8 Order to Show Cause (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be remanded. Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perri v. CA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Perri
Represented By: Randal M. Barnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA, Inc.
Represented By: Kraig Douglas Jennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?