Yared et al v. America's Servicing Company et al
Plaintiff: Joel Yared and Narisa Yared
Defendant: America's Servicing Company, FSB Citibank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDEX West Trustee, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv02742
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/19/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR CLERK OF COURT TO REASSIGN CASE, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Objections to R&R due by 10/14/2010. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 THIRD ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/17/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/9/2010. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yared et al v. America's Servicing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Yared
Represented By: Kenneth Raymond Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narisa Yared
Represented By: Kenneth Raymond Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSB Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West Trustee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?