Zeyen v. California Department of Motor Vehicles
Plaintiff: Randy Zeyen
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Case Number: 3:2010cv02753
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice, provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy theron on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 23, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting [26-1] Request to appear by phone filed by California Department of Motor Vehicles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/18/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-11. A Case Management Conference is set for July 29, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statment shall be filed no later than July 22, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/23/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than December 21, 2010, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. In the event plaintiff files a Notice of Need for Mediation by December 21, 2010, this order will be discharged. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/7/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeyen v. California Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Zeyen
Represented By: Amy Richelle Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: David Pai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?