Stagg et al v. Ananda Fuara Restaurant et al

Plaintiff: Ashanka Stagg, Damian Sequoia, Lucian Balmer and Sundari Michaelian
Defendant: Ananda Fuara Restaurant, Garima Inc, Garima Hoffman, SRI Chinmoy Society Inc and SRI Chinmoy Centre
Case Number: 3:2010cv02768
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 33 Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2011. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 20, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
November 8, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/8/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
August 10, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation for Filing of First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8-10-10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stagg et al v. Ananda Fuara Restaurant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashanka Stagg
Represented By: Moira Collette McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Sequoia
Represented By: Moira Collette McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucian Balmer
Represented By: Moira Collette McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundari Michaelian
Represented By: Moira Collette McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ananda Fuara Restaurant
Represented By: James T. Diamond, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garima Inc
Represented By: James T. Diamond, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garima Hoffman
Represented By: James T. Diamond, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI Chinmoy Society Inc
Represented By: April Nicole Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI Chinmoy Centre
Represented By: April Nicole Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?