Wade et al v. Minatta Transportation Company et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Wade and Kevin R. Baer
Defendant: Minatta Transportation Company and Shamrock Materials, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02796
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 39 Motion for Settlement; granting 21 Motion for Settlement (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/22/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade et al v. Minatta Transportation Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Wade
Represented By: Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R. Baer
Represented By: Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minatta Transportation Company
Represented By: Patrick John Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick John Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?