Openwave Systems Inc. v. Myriad France S.A.S.
Plaintiff: Openwave Systems Inc.
Defendant: Myriad France S.A.S.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02805
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE re 382 Pretrial Memorandum filed by Myriad France S.A.S.. Signed by Judge Breyer on August 26, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING MYRIAD'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 336 Motion in Limine.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Motions in Limine and Oppositions and Exhibits in Support Thereof; Declaration of Samuel R. Hellfeld filed by Myriad Fra nce S.A.S., 337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal OMNIBUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 79-5 RE: JOINT PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER, TRIAL BRIEF, AND PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; OPPOSITI ONS TO MYRIAD filed by Openwave Systems Inc., 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 Re: Proposed Findings of Fact; Declaration of Samuel R. Hellfeld filed by Myriad France S.A.S.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 15, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE re 331 Letter filed by Openwave Systems Inc., 330 Letter filed by Myriad France S.A.S.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER DENYING re 317 Letter Brief, filed by Openwave Systems Inc. for Failure to comply with the Court's Order, dated 4/28/11, to meet and confer in person, and file a joint letter. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/1/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEYS KENNY, FLINN, and FENBY re 322 Notice (Other) filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 308 STIPULATED ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 307 Stipulation filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING re 272 Statement filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER re 213 Stipulation Resolving Discovery Dispute filed by Openwave Systems Inc., Myriad France S.A.S.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/20/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER ADDING THRESHOLD ISSUE re 26 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement,,. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 17, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup denying 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 145 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 168 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO RE-FILE DECLARATIONS re 206 Letter filed by Myriad France S.A.S., 212 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER REGARDING EQUIPMENT FOR HEARINGS re 220 Letter filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER RE PRECIS RE DECLARATIONS re 206 Letter filed by Myriad France S.A.S.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER; ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Lead trial counsel, in person, meet an confer, shall be no later than 5/6/11. Myriad's opening brief shall be filed by 5/9/11. Responses due by 5/16/2011. Replies due by 5/20/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/28/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SECOND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Request to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L. R. 79-5; Declaration of Ryan L. Scher in Support Thereof filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 121 Letter filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 31, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 24, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING ON FEBRUARY 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES SET AT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 57 Letter Brief filed by Myriad France S.A.S.]. Meet-and-confer set from 8:00--11:00 AM on 2/28/2011, in Court's jury room, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery Hearing set for 2/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/23/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 18, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIM AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 45 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY re 41 Letter Brief filed by Myriad France S.A.S., 39 Letter Brief, filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 21, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 39 Letter Brief, filed by Openwave Systems Inc.] Discovery Hearing set for 12/21/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Further meet-and-confer in Court's jury room from 8:00--11:00 a.m. on 12/21/2010. Defendant's response due noon on 12/20/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Openwave Systems Inc. v. Myriad France S.A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Openwave Systems Inc.
Represented By: Dion M. Bregman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myriad France S.A.S.
Represented By: Diego F. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?