Phillips v. Nationwide Credit, Inc
Plaintiff: Tommy Phillips
Defendant: Nationwide Credit, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv02843
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/5/2011 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2011. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 to extend the early neutral evaluation conference deadline. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: 10 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Nationwide Credit, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Phillips
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Credit, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?