Vargas v. City of Brentwood et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Vargas
Defendant: City of Brentwood, Thomas Kaps, Timothy King, Anthony Bustillos, Joseph Lang, Christopher Peart, Anthony Oerlemans and Mark Evenson
Case Number: 3:2010cv02925
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 Stipulation MODIFYING ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS: Close of Non-Expert Discovery: 10/28/2011. Last Day for Expert Disclosure: 11/4/2011. Last day for Expert Expert Discovery: 12/16/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation, filed by Anthony Bustillos, Mark Evenson, Christopher Peart, Timothy King, Thomas Kaps, Anthony Oerlemans, City of Brentwood, Joseph Lang. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/8/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation filed by Anthony Bustillos, Mark Evenson, Christopher Peart, Timothy King, Thomas Kaps, Anthony Oerlemans, City of Brentwood, Joseph Lang. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/3/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Stipulation REQUESTING MODIFICATION TO CASE MANAGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 Stipulation CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. City of Brentwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Vargas
Represented By: Peter J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Brentwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kaps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bustillos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Peart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Oerlemans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?