Legrama et al v. America's Servicing Company et al
Plaintiff: Christina Legrama and Henry Banaga
Defendant: America's Servicing Company, Fremont Investment & Loan, U.S. Pacific Loans, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Fremont General Credit Corporation, Commonwealth Land Title Company and Stephen R. Williams
Case Number: 3:2010cv02945
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, 57 MOTION to Strike 55 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, 56 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and A uthorities Motion to Strike Immaterial and Impertinent Allegation in the First Amended Complaint; Memorandum o MOTION to Strike 55 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, 56 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Motion to Strike Immaterial and Impertinent Allegation in the First Amended Complaint; Memorandum o, 64 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Signature Group Holdings, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amende d Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Signature Group Holdings, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amende d Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 56 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities : Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/23/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS re 47 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, America's Servicing Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CMC & RELATED DEADLINES re 44 MOTION to Continue Change Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 filed by Fremont General Credit Corporation, ***Deadlines terminated. 44 MOTION to Continue Change Time Pursuant to Civil Lo cal Rule 6-3 filed by Fremont General Credit Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/9/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on October 6, 2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2010: # 1 Certificate of Service) (mejlc1, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE REPORT RE SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SECOND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/20/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/14/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legrama et al v. America's Servicing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Donald John Querio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Investment & Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Pacific Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont General Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Legrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Banaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?