American Guarantee And Liability Insurance Company v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: American Guarantee And Liability Insurance Company
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv03009
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/1/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Notice of reference and Order re: discovery procedure. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/11/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 TO RESET THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DEADLINE OF FEBRUARY 28, 2011 TO MARCH 31, 2011 Stipulation filed by American Guarantee And Liability Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CHANGE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTIN FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Motions Hearing set for 3/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: 11 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Guarantee And Liability Insurance Company v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guarantee And Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?