Federal Home Loan Bank of San Francisco v. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Bank of San Francisco
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc., DB Structured Products, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II, Inc, The Bear Stearns Companies, LLC, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, RBS Securities, Inc., RBS Acceptance, Inc, RBS Holdings USA, Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, UBS Securities, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc, Wamu Capital Corp and Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03039
Filed: July 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 71 Motion to Remand (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation's Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Order (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 11/15/10 is continued to 2/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/11/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Defendants opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand is due 9/24/10; Defendants may have up to 30 pages for their omnibus opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand; Plaintiffs reply is due by 10/19/10; Plaintiff shall have up to 20 pages for its reply to defendants' omnibus opposition.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/20/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Briefing on Pltf's Motion to Remand and placing the motion on 11/5/10 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/25/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Home Loan Bank of San Francisco v. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Bank of San Francisco
Represented By: Robert A. Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Deepa Shailesh Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Deepa Shailesh Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Structured Products, Inc.
Represented By: Deepa Shailesh Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Suneeta Daisy Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II, Inc
Represented By: Suneeta Daisy Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bear Stearns Companies, LLC
Represented By: Suneeta Daisy Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Securities Corporation
Represented By: Eugene G. Illovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Susan Coll-Very
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Acceptance, Inc
Represented By: Alexis Susan Coll-Very
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Holdings USA, Inc
Represented By: Alexis Susan Coll-Very
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities, LLC
Represented By: John Stephen Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc
Represented By: John Stephen Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc
Represented By: Eugene G. Illovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wamu Capital Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp.
Represented By: Suneeta Daisy Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?