Association of Irritated Residents v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa Jackson and Jared Blumenfeld
Case Number: 3:2010cv03051
Filed: July 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REQUESTING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES re 31 Stipulation filed by Lisa Jackson, Jared Blumenfeld, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 11 Stipulation filed by Lisa Jackson, Jared Blumenfeld, United States Environmental Protection Agency]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/11/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Alegria Guadalupe De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?