Peterson v. AT&T Disability Income Plan
Plaintiff: Judi Peterson
Defendant: AT&T Disability Income Plan
Case Number: 3:2010cv03097
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING re 91 Plaintiff's Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference set for 1/27/12 filed by Judi Peterson. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION - Until 1/10/12 for Plaintiff to file a motion re: back benefits. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 23, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER for Defendant to produce administrative record and for Plaintiff to file amended trial briefs with citations to administrative record. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 28, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SEALING ORDER. Exhibit B to the Decl of Brent D. Brehm in Support of Pla's Opening Brief shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/21/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR TRIAL ON THE PAPERS. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/10/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING re 12 Proposed Order To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Judi Peterson. Case Management Conference re-set for 1/28/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/27/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. AT&T Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judi Peterson
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?