Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America and SD-3C LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv03098
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 178 Motion for Leave to File Reply; granting 180 Motion for Leave to File Response (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE 169 Administrative MOTION to Lift Discovery Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO OPERATIVE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/4/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING 140 Joint MOTION To Set Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 109 Stipulation REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/31/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Stipulation Regarding Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on October 22, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 68 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/5/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 60 Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/20/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 08/04/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Monique Mendez O'Donoghue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/20/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Evan Robert Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Represented By: Aldo A. Badini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Aldo A. Badini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SD-3C LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?