Hudson v. First Transit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adrienne Hudson
Defendant: First Transit, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03158
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 88 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CERTAIN SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 23, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL, Motions terminated: 52 MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing On Plaintiff's (Unopposed) Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing On Plaintiff's (Unopposed) Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Adrienne Hudson, 51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Adrienne Hudson. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 27, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REGARDING JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 17, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 43 Letter Brief, filed by Adrienne Hudson]. Meet-and-confer in Court's jury room starting from 9:30 a.m. and ending at 1:30 p.m. on 3/22/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 3/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/15/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER EXTENDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Strike (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 7, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. First Transit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Hudson
Represented By: Teresa Demchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?